Financial history ST PATRICK'S COLLEGE JAFFNA ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1088167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £151.24k £29.81k £25.53k £43.62k £27.66k
Total expenditure £146.03k £35.50k £12.72k £25.50k £28.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A