Trustees ST PATRICK'S COLLEGE JAFFNA ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK
Charity number: 1088167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mario Constantine | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Polinus Jehan Wincesslaus | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Puvirajasinghe Romesh | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariflo Mariyanayagam | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jude Andrew | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thavaratnam Nixon Thirumaran | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rasaratnam Shahjahan | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chelvakumar Joseph Sabapathy | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anton Dylan Constantine | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rajeswaran Vakeesan | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Vetha louis | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marino Antonipillai | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justin Imayakanthan Navaratnam | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anton Wilson Joseph | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR T D Rajasooriyer | Trustee | 21 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Mahendra Constantine | Trustee | 28 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARIASOOSAI CONSTANTINE PATHMARAJAH | Trustee | 18 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR N R RUBAKUMAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ANTON SANDRASAGRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWIN GUNARATNAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH GONSAL RAJMOHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.