YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1084619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £77.37k £72.25k £38.47k £22.23k £50.90k
Total expenditure £85.55k £61.38k £74.46k £25.35k £42.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A