THE INTERNATIONAL GOLF CHARITY

Charity number: 1085994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £261.19k £299.88k £299.00k £185.51k £19.43k
Total expenditure £235.91k £323.27k £301.88k £204.86k £28.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A