CITIZENS ADVICE CAERPHILLY BLAENAU GWENT

Charity number: 1084045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.23m £3.20m £3.25m £3.30m £3.76m
Total expenditure £2.03m £2.32m £3.73m £3.15m £3.53m
Income from government contracts £179.88k £134.66k £153.27k £176.12k £198.17k
Income from government grants £701.91k £1.56m £249.24k £224.24k £3.12m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £1.09k £275.64k £227.16k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.00m £2.36m £2.97m £3.07m £438.94k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.11k £1.66k £816 £1.21k £1.39k
Income - Other £227.45k £835.37k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.03m £2.32m £3.73m £3.15m £3.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.48k £5.40k £7.06k £6.53k £75.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0