Financial history HALIFAX OPPORTUNITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1086183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.04m £4.68m £4.98m £4.23m £4.41m
Total expenditure £4.78m £4.47m £4.84m £4.38m £4.45m
Income from government contracts £2.65m £2.26m £2.76m £2.06m £2.06m
Income from government grants £85.00k £299.53k £152.44k £992.93k £896.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £97.00k £149.26k £153.24k £116.91k £117.22k
Income - Other trading activities £628.74k £365.64k £633.43k £448.63k £549.68k
Income - Charitable activities £4.31m £4.17m £4.19m £3.67m £3.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £66 £0 £2.16k £447 £91
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.78m £4.06m £4.38m £4.01m £4.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.25k £12.56k £30.71k £41.71k £52.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £400.60k £453.45k £370.01k £459.36k