Financial history THE COUNCIL OF EUROPEAN JAMAATS

Charity number: 1096111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.18m £2.58m £3.09m £2.31m £3.17m
Total expenditure £1.66m £2.49m £2.40m £2.32m £3.10m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.10m £53.36k £2.13m £1.75m £3.16m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £826.40k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £137.57k £299.98k £628.33k £475.13k £7.17k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £538.07k £0 £332.42k £87.74k £0
Income - Other £399.37k £1.40m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £864.68k £1.68m £2.23m £1.84m £3.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £200.31k £252.56k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £122.03k £115.10k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £70.03k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £593.59k £555.50k £170.70k £477.29k £7.16k