Trustees THE COUNCIL OF EUROPEAN JAMAATS
Charity number: 1096111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
35 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Salim Rehmatullah | Chair | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Camil HIRIDJEE | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hussein Elias | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Mehboob Dossa | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abbas Manji | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mehdi Najafi | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naushad Dhanji | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Azmina Hansraj | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nawal Jeraj | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shakil Dharas | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Qasim Ali Alidina | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aliasgar Khimani | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Altaf Hussein Ahmed Daya | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sultan Kanani | Trustee | 18 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shabbir Merali | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sajjad Mohamed Raza Manji | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miqdad Ghulamabbas Master | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
FATIM RIYAZ BANDALI | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Faysal Pirmohamed | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nasima Azim Karim | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Azadali Kassamali Poptani | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naime Vally | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Murtaza Manzoorali M Kanani | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Muraj | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Riaz Amirali Kaba | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muntazir Ebrahim Haji | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Soudjad Cassam-Chenai | Trustee | 31 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sibtain Allibhai | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Shakir Rahemtulla | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAMRAN SHAH | Trustee | 03 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Husein Jiwa | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR Arif Hiridjee | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR RASOOL BHAMANI | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Hussein Rahemtulla | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR MURTAZA BHARWANI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.