CO-OPERATIVE COMMUNITY INVESTMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 September 2016 On time Download