THE RAINBOW OF HOPE/PARADISE RUN

Charity number: 1088856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2020 15 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2020 15 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 15 October 2019 15 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2019 15 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 15 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 15 October 2017 16 August 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2017 16 August 2018 1 days late Download
Annual return 15 October 2016 14 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2016 14 August 2017 On time Download