ST ALBANS CITY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1089343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £213.96k £271.15k £171.61k £261.89k £284.37k
Total expenditure £167.28k £243.06k £178.24k £272.93k £248.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A