THE FELL PONY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1104945
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £101.15k £124.63k £225.10k £71.02k £56.44k
Total expenditure £88.72k £68.14k £78.04k £88.97k £74.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A