Governing document THE FELL PONY SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/08/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2014 as amended on 14 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") OF THE SOCIETY ARE:- 3.1 TO FOSTER AND KEEP PURE THE OLD BREED OF NATIVE PONY WHICH HAS ROAMED THE NORTHERN FELLS FOR CENTURIES 3.2 TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE BREEDING OF REGISTERED FELL PONIES 3.3 TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE FELL PONY BREED AND ITS ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE ACQUISITION AND DISTRIBUTION OF KNOWLEDGE OF ALL MATTERS CONCERNING THE FELL PONY BREED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE ISLE OF MAN, THE NETHERLANDS, GERMANY, FRANCE AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.