HOMELESS LINK

Charity number: 1089173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 December 2017 On time Download