DAME VERA LYNN CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1089657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time Download