DAME VERA LYNN CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1089657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paula Barnes Trustee 07 October 2019 None on record
ALAN TOM JONES Trustee
DAME VERA LYNN MEMORIAL STATUE Recently registered
THE DAME VERA LYNN CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
TIMOTHY LYNDON WRIGHT Trustee None on record
John Michael Nicholas Dutt Chair 20 January 2021
THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF ST GEORGE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
DEBORAH HAY Trustee 12 December 2016
THE FRIENDS OF ST BEDES SCHOOL, REDHILL Received: On time
Douglas William Hill Trustee 02 March 2020 None on record
Tracey Ann Trotter Trustee 02 March 2020 None on record
Colin Malcolm Darnell Trustee 07 October 2019
THE YEWS (HAYWARDS HEATH) COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP Received: On time
Nicci Long Trustee 20 October 2021 None on record