DAME VERA LYNN CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1089657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £444.59k £492.71k £300.46k £334.10k £468.31k
Total expenditure £266.01k £334.01k £394.34k £460.14k £408.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £31.00k