EASTERN REGION MINISTRY COURSE

Charity number: 1090989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £368.14k £419.15k £392.27k £452.68k £456.28k
Total expenditure £395.31k £433.87k £427.38k £433.87k £360.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A