EASTERN REGION MINISTRY COURSE

Charity number: 1090989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Timothy Llewellyn Jones Trustee 23 October 2015
LATHBURY INSTITUTE OR HALL Received: On time
REVD CANON NICHOLAS MOIR Trustee 24 February 2014 None on record
Rev David Brereton Foster Trustee 19 October 2012 None on record
Rev STEPHEN MICHAEL BENOY Trustee 21 July 2011 None on record
The Revd Dr Alexander Soenderup Jensen Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
SUSAN POPE Trustee None on record
Ven Alexander James Hughes Trustee 17 June 2016
CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (HUNTS CLERGY CHARITY) Received: On time
Rev Philip Alan Need Trustee 04 December 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR JOYCE MARGARET HILL Trustee 17 June 2016 None on record
Rt Revd Richard William Bryant Atkinson OBE Chair 17 October 2014
LUTON ROMA TRUST
JUST FINANCE FOUNDATION Received: On time
ST ETHELDREDA'S HOME Received: On time
Rev WILLIAM DOUGLAS FITZGERALD GULLIFORD Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, REGENT'S PARK Received: On time