Financial history CAMEROON ASYLUM SUPPORT ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1093422
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £54.68k £78.69k £45.79k £42.70k £67.28k
Total expenditure £61.72k £66.98k £47.81k £64.70k £93.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A