Accounts and annual returns GRASMERE VILLAGE HALL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1090563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 13 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 13 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required