Trustees GRASMERE VILLAGE HALL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1090563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEFFREY ROBERT COWTON Chair
None on record
Karen Taylor Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Steve Watts Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Pamela Harrington Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Andrew Astle Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
David Johnson Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Graham Magennis Trustee 21 March 2018
None on record
Paul Mosey Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record
Stephen Richard Dodd Trustee 24 August 2016
None on record
ANDREW LEECH Trustee
None on record