Trustees SEVERN VALLEY RAILWAY CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1092723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Ernest Ball Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Timothy Adrian Hargest Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record
Keith Richard Norton Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Laura Manning Shoaf CBE Trustee 30 March 2020
CURE LEUKAEMIA
Received: On time
Paul Christopher Fathers TD MA MBA Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
ALFRED DAVID OWEN OBE Trustee 15 October 2018
BLACK COUNTRY URBAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION
Received: On time
THE GRIMMITT TRUST
Received: On time
CHC EVANGELISM TRUST
Received: On time
OLD HALL PEOPLES PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
MILL DAM TRUST
Received: On time
DARLASTON YOUTH CENTRE
Received: On time
NEW HALL WATER MILL PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
DARLASTON BOYS' CLUB
Received: On time
SUTTON COLDFIELD YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE WALSALL MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: 48 days late
THE OWEN FAMILY TRUST
Received: On time
Ronald Treverton-Jones Trustee 03 October 2016
ESTATE CHARITY OF ALICE,DUCHESS DUDLEY
Received: On time
Diane Elizabeth Malyon Trustee 18 January 2012
None on record