THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1093347
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 August 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 September 2021 65 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 August 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 August 2020 60 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time Download