Financial history THE WYCOMBE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1094917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £1.56k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £16.90k £401 £0 £50 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A