Trustees THE WYCOMBE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE LTD
Charity number: 1094917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Alan Murphy | Chair | 18 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Ann Huxley | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Hawes | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzi Jones | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Lucy Tollitt | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarfaraz Khan Raja | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.