LEEDS ASYLUM SEEKERS SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1092647
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Murdoch-Eaton Trustee 25 January 2021
SAYIT (SHEENA AMOS YOUTH TRUST) Received: On time
Stephen Maw Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Noel Nowosielski Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
Yoshiko Stokoe Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Lindewe Akhona Ndudane Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Helen Olga Fiorenza Radelaar Trustee 25 January 2021
CHRIST CHURCH ARMLEY COMMUNITY PROJECTS LTD Received: On time
Janice Gupta Gwilliam Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
Mahmoud el Saboni Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Jonathan Long Trustee 29 September 2017 None on record
Nicolle Levine Trustee 03 October 2019 None on record
Ian Garforth Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
William Robert Urry Trustee 30 September 2016 None on record
John Ekblom Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record