Accounts and annual returns THE PLYMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 1094085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required