Financial history THE PLYMOUTH U3A

Charity number: 1094085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.43k £15.81k £27.00k £13.43k £14.71k
Total expenditure £14.78k £14.96k £25.87k £10.39k £12.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A