THE ORRELL TRUST

Charity number: 1096549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £55.63k £52.37k £67.25k £87.50k £81.62k
Total expenditure £10.58k £37.55k £80.89k £69.48k £73.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A