AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yasmine Zolfaghari-Nia Trustee 16 December 2020
AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Maria Mahmoodi Karimzad Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Noorzia Aimaq Trustee 16 December 2020
AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Sayed Hadi Sina Trustee 07 June 2020 None on record
Paul Lehmann Trustee 30 November 2019 None on record
Philip Ruark-Davis Chair 08 February 2021
AFGHANISTAN & CENTRAL ASIAN ASSOCIATION Received: On time