COMMUNITY WORKS CIO

Charity number: 1096518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £548.63k £424.55k £332.61k £341.17k £694.10k
Total expenditure £544.41k £422.89k £320.65k £279.03k £448.81k
Income from government contracts £316.10k £312.27k £130.34k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £106.54k £14.29k £9.23k £37.17k £20.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £547.52k N/A N/A N/A £360.24k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £330.34k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £2 N/A N/A N/A £839
Income - Other £1.10k N/A N/A N/A £2.68k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £544.41k N/A N/A N/A £448.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0