COMMUNITY WORKS CIO

Charity number: 1096518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID SHARP Chair
COMMUNITY FIRST YORKSHIRE LTD Received: On time
Lesley Ann Ford Trustee 23 November 2015 None on record
Timothy Ward Trustee 25 January 2021 None on record
Malcolm Sollitt Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
David Shorrocks Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record
GEORGINA TURTON Trustee 22 January 2020
MEMORIAL HALL Received: On time
SALLY BURTON Trustee 14 November 2016
THIRSK COMMUNITY LIBRARY Received: On time
Anna Patricia Naughton Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
David Reginald Tucker Trustee 25 January 2021 None on record
Christopher Snowden Trustee 12 June 2018 None on record
Rachael Anne Robertson Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Rebecca Evermar Lawson-Tancred Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record