Trustees ST MARY'S THURSDAY CLUB
Charity number: 1095432
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Myson | Chair | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Joanna Marie Barton | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Hugh Michael Protherough | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Audrey Smith | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jennifer Marion Smithson | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Nigel Johnson | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Dale Gingrich | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Maggie Impey | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.