Trustees SOCIAL CARE IN ACTION

Charity number: 1096903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Hickman Chair 28 May 2015
FLAT SPACES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE STEVEN JAMES PRACTICE
Received: On time
OPTIONS WELLBEING TRUST
Received: On time
THOMAS EDWIN YENDELL Trustee 31 August 2022
FLAT SPACES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Saharesh Ali Trustee 31 August 2022
FLAT SPACES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
David Martin Ball Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Andrew Tonkin Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Beth Aarons Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Nick Kohn Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Darcy Corben Trustee 03 March 2021
THE STEVEN JAMES PRACTICE
Received: On time
OPTIONS WELLBEING TRUST
Received: On time
Robert Dickenson Trustee 21 March 2018
WILTSHIRE CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING LIMITED
Received: On time
Dominic Lodge Trustee 30 October 2013
OPTIONS WELLBEING TRUST
Received: On time
Les Judd Trustee 25 November 2011
None on record