Financial history WIRRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1096933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £151.27k £165.13k £196.82k £244.42k £216.84k
Total expenditure £170.04k £157.36k £191.54k £219.98k £163.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £59.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £17.50k N/A £6.26k N/A