Trustees WIRRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1096933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karl Greaney | Chair | 19 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Philip Cardus | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Owens | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Davies | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Walters Mrs | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Collinson Mrs | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR RON ABBEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL WILLIAM TOWNLEY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.