BOREHAMWOOD AND ELSTREE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1096170
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £4.43k £4.56k £4.33k £4.22k £5.68k
Total expenditure £3.45k £3.18k £3.67k £4.21k £5.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A