AFRICAN AGRICULTURAL TECHNOLOGY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107507
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £13.75m £24.55m £15.32m £16.15m £18.06m
Total expenditure £14.77m £18.20m £16.50m £12.84m £14.04m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £1.37m £1.83m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £23.38m £14.55m £14.36m £15.29m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £41.79k £117.76k
Income - Charitable activities £13.71m £0 £0 £951.85k £2.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.31k £197.80k £139.62k £141.14k £227.28k
Income - Other £0 £965.39k £629.22k £650.16k £349.03k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.49m £17.94m £16.27m £12.84m £14.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £128.35k £145.76k £335.82k £237.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £9.50m £8.47m £4.46m £5.02m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £277.91k £262.46k £235.33k £0 £0