AFRICAN AGRICULTURAL TECHNOLOGY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107507
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George Sarpong Trustee 15 December 2018 None on record
Anne Glover Trustee 29 October 2015 None on record
Shey Romanus Tata Trustee 31 October 2019 None on record
Dr Canisius Kanangire Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
Sylvia Horemans Trustee 15 December 2018 None on record
Dahlia Garwe Trustee 31 October 2019 None on record
Jessica Colaco Trustee 15 December 2018 None on record
Ingrid Wünning Tschol Trustee 03 November 2016 None on record
Dr Jeremy Tinga Ouedraogo Trustee 29 October 2015 None on record
Dr OUSMANE BADIANE Chair 09 April 2015 None on record
Hamadi Boga Trustee 19 May 2020 None on record