SOUTH OF ENGLAND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096222
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARILYN TOFT Trustee 11 December 2013 None on record
Paul Richard Statham Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
Ken Francis Palmer Trustee 01 May 2015 None on record
Luke Christopher Ashworth Trustee 10 September 2014 None on record
Christopher James Lunn Trustee 10 June 2020 None on record
Tracy Anne Herd Trustee 02 December 2000 None on record
Simon Robert Charlick Trustee 10 June 2020
REDTHREAD YOUTH LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Calum George Coker Trustee 10 June 2020 None on record
PETER COUSINS Trustee None on record
Martin Patrick Griffiths Trustee 10 June 2020 None on record