GROUNDWORK WALES

Charity number: 1096662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time Download