GROUNDWORK WALES

Charity number: 1096662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.64m £1.74m £1.24m £1.07m £1.49m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.66m £1.21m £1.06m £1.65m
Income from government contracts £440.00k £0 £33.38k £32.79k N/A
Income from government grants £300.00k £942.45k £804.30k £407.65k £494.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £5.18k £80.15k £7.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.64m £1.74m £1.23m £991.94k £1.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £7
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £29.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.66m £1.66m £1.21m £1.06m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.45k £0 £3.35k £23.09k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £130.47k £150.30k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0