TOWER HAMLETS FRIENDS AND NEIGHBOURS

Charity number: 1099403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £193.34k £202.23k £224.47k £195.87k £176.40k
Total expenditure £190.61k £190.77k £218.09k £205.02k £180.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £35.00k £25.00k
Income from government grants £34.00k £35.00k £35.00k N/A N/A