BLUE VENTURES CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1098893

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN MORRISON WAREHAM Trustee 06 May 2014 None on record
Gavin Starks Trustee 25 April 2018
LONGPLAYER TRUST Received: On time
ANNA SORREL KYDD Trustee 27 August 2014
THE ALTRO FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time
OLIVER CHARLES GREGSON Trustee 25 April 2018
HELP FOR HEROES Received: On time
THE GREGSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Robert Michael Maclay Trustee 24 January 2018 None on record
Frances Humber Trustee 27 April 2018
THE FRIENDS OF TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK Received: On time