Financial history SS PETER & PAUL R C PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATON

Charity number: 1097373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £12.00k £8.58k £4.18k £3.39k £548
Total expenditure £8.72k £8.62k £16.68k £4.12k £1.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A