ST AUGUSTINE'S PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1097781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 01 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 01 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 15 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On time Download