Accounts and annual returns ST AUSTELL BREWERY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1105828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 13 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 September 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 04 November 2020 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 27 January 2020 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 27 January 2020 149 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window