Pestalozzi International Foundation

Charity number: 1098422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £906.29k £1.13m £702.96k £522.15k £194.90k
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.30m £1.68m £829.96k £421.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £7.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £863.42k £1.08m £666.07k £498.68k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £7.76k £23.80k £17.26k £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £33.81k £28.13k £19.25k £21.01k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.30k £91 £376 £2.46k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £304.12k £206.68k £69.41k £46.22k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £1.14m £1.50m £708.73k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £108.46k £136.24k £149.95k £90.46k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.42k £13.52k £0 £10.35k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £26.24k £28.85k £28.85k £30.77k N/A