Pestalozzi International Foundation

Charity number: 1098422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Natalia Blank Trustee 24 April 2020 None on record
David Ian Little Trustee 04 October 2019 None on record
David George Dixson Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Aaron Matthew Eckhoff Trustee 19 July 2019 None on record
Pradeep Subedi Trustee 24 April 2020 None on record
Mark Stanton Trustee 19 January 2021 None on record